John Unsworth is interim chair, serving the remainder of Martin Mueller's term. I believe Martin's original term was for February 1 or March 1, 2011 through January 31, 2013 or February 28, 2013, but whatever the date is, it should be recorded at http://www.tei-c.org/About/board.xml . The same goes for other appointed positions.
Happy to make this change presumably on http://www.tei-c.org/About/board.xml but will need to know the dates for all appointed people. I will ask a board member if they can tell me or find out for me.
Yes, http://www.tei-c.org/About/board.xml is the page I was suggesting a change on.
James, have you found out any information about all appointment dates?
Added term to Pierazzo appointment per announcement on TEI-L. Reassigning to James to determine what term was set for Unsworth's term as treasurer.
Mine as Council Chair was 01 January 2012 - 31 December 2013.
John's was: 01 January 2013 through 31 December 31 2014.
Have updated website with dates -- feel free to change if you prefer done differently. Closing Ticket